CT SB00423 | 2019 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Democrat 10-1)
Status: Introduced on January 23 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-04-08 - File Number 512
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 23 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-04-08 - File Number 512
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Summary
To authorize the Commissioner of Transportation to construct, maintain and operate electronic tolling systems on Interstate 84, Interstate 91, Interstate 95 and portions of Connecticut Route 15 to fund transportation projects.
Title
An Act Concerning Funding For Connecticut's Transportation Future.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-03-20 - Joint - TRA Vote Tally Sheet (Y: 23 N: 13 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-08 - Joint - TRA Vote Tally Sheet (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-07 - Joint - TRA Vote Tally Sheet (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-08 - Joint - TRA Vote Tally Sheet (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-07 - Joint - TRA Vote Tally Sheet (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-04-08 | Senate | File Number 512 |
2019-04-08 | Senate | Senate Calendar Number 265 |
2019-04-08 | Senate | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate |
2019-04-08 | Senate | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2019-04-01 | Senate | Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 04/08/19 10:00 AM |
2019-03-21 | Senate | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2019-03-20 | Senate | Joint Favorable |
2019-03-18 | Senate | Referred to Joint Committee on Transportation |
2019-03-15 | Senate | Drafted by Committee |
2019-03-08 | Senate | Vote to Draft |
2019-02-28 | Senate | Public Hearing 03/04 |
2019-02-07 | Senate | Reserved for Subject Matter Public Hearing |
2019-01-23 | Senate | Referred to Joint Committee on Transportation |