CT SB00435 | 2018 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Introduced on March 7 2018 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-04-11 - Referred by Senate to Committee on Judiciary
Pending: Joint Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on March 7 2018 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-04-11 - Referred by Senate to Committee on Judiciary
Pending: Joint Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Summary
To permit the sale and use of consumer grade fireworks.
Title
An Act Concerning The Sale And Use Of Consumer Grade Fireworks.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-03-20 - Joint - GL Vote Tally Sheet (Y: 12 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-04-11 | Senate | Referred by Senate to Committee on Judiciary |
2018-04-04 | Senate | File Number 226 |
2018-04-04 | Senate | Senate Calendar Number 143 |
2018-04-04 | Senate | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate |
2018-04-04 | Senate | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2018-03-28 | Senate | Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 04/03/18 5:00 PM |
2018-03-20 | Senate | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2018-03-20 | Senate | Joint Favorable Substitute |
2018-03-13 | Senate | Public Hearing 03/15 |
2018-03-07 | Senate | Referred to Joint Committee on General Law |