CT SB00469 | 2019 | General Assembly

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 13-1-1)
Status: Passed on July 8 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-07-08 - Signed by the Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]

Summary

To require the Public Utilities Regulatory Authority to initiate and issue a final decision in a docket to establish standards for acceptable performance and minimum staffing and equipment levels for electric distribution companies.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

An Act Requiring The Public Utilities Regulatory Authority To Study Performance Standards And Minimum Staffing And Equipment Levels For Electric Distribution Companies.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-06-05 - House - House Roll Call Vote 349 AS AMENDED (Y: 139 N: 7 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2019-05-30 - Senate - Senate Roll Call Vote 253 ADOPT SENATE AMD B LCO 9792 (Y: 11 N: 21 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2019-05-30 - Senate - Senate Roll Call Vote 254 PASS AS AMENDED BY SEN A (Y: 32 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-14 - Joint - ET Vote Tally Sheet (Y: 20 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-02-26 - Joint - ET Vote Tally Sheet (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-05 - Joint - ET Vote Tally Sheet (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-07-08SenateSigned by the Governor
2019-06-24SenateTransmitted by Secretary of the State to Governor
2019-06-24SenateTransmitted to the Secretary of State
2019-06-19SenateSpecial Act 19-15
2019-06-05SenateIn Concurrence
2019-06-05SenateHouse Passed as Amended by Senate Amendment Schedule A
2019-06-05SenateHouse Adopted Senate Amendment Schedule A
2019-06-01SenateHouse Calendar Number 690
2019-06-01SenateFavorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House
2019-05-30SenateSenate Passed as Amended by Senate Amendment Schedule A
2019-05-30SenateSenate Rejected Senate Amendment Schedule B 9792
2019-05-30SenateSenate Adopted Senate Amendment Schedule A 9084
2019-03-28SenateFile Number 218
2019-03-28SenateSenate Calendar Number 114
2019-03-28SenateFavorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate
2019-03-28SenateReported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office
2019-03-22SenateReferred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 03/27/19 5:00 PM
2019-03-15SenateFiled with Legislative Commissioners' Office
2019-03-14SenateJoint Favorable
2019-03-13SenateReferred to Joint Committee on Energy and Technology
2019-03-12SenateDrafted by Committee
2019-02-26SenateVote to Draft
2019-02-15SenatePublic Hearing 02/21
2019-02-05SenateReserved for Subject Matter Public Hearing
2019-01-24SenateReferred to Joint Committee on Energy and Technology

Connecticut State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttps://www.cga.ct.gov/asp/cgabillstatus/cgabillstatus.asp?selBillType=Bill&bill_num=SB00469&which_year=2019
Texthttps://www.cga.ct.gov/2019/TOB/s/pdf/2019SB-00469-R00-SB.PDF
Texthttps://www.cga.ct.gov/2019/TOB/s/pdf/2019SB-00469-R01-SB.PDF
Texthttps://www.cga.ct.gov/2019/TOB/s/pdf/2019SB-00469-R02-SB.PDF
Texthttps://www.cga.ct.gov/2019/ACT/sa/pdf/2019SA-00015-R00SB-00469-SA.pdf
Roll Callhttps://www.cga.ct.gov/2019/TS/s/pdf/2019SB-00469-R00ET-CV40-TS.pdf
Roll Callhttps://www.cga.ct.gov/2019/TS/s/pdf/2019SB-00469-R00ET-CV58-TS.pdf
Roll Callhttps://www.cga.ct.gov/2019/TS/s/pdf/2019SB-00469-R00ET-CV75-TS.pdf
Roll Callhttps://www.cga.ct.gov/2019/VOTE/s/pdf/2019SV-00254-R00SB00469-SV.pdf
Roll Callhttps://www.cga.ct.gov/2019/VOTE/s/pdf/2019SV-00253-R00SB00469-SV.pdf
Roll Callhttps://www.cga.ct.gov/2019/VOTE/h/pdf/2019HV-00349-R00SB00469-HV.pdf

Bill Comments

feedback