CT SB00504 | 2019 | General Assembly

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on July 1 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-07-01 - Signed by the Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]

Summary

To divert children in motor vehicle theft or misuse delinquency cases to treatment or other programs and to modify the grounds under which a child may be detained.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

An Act Concerning The Suspension Of Delinquency Proceedings For Treatment Or Other Services In Motor Vehicle Theft Or Misuse Cases And Concerning Detention Of Juveniles.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-06-05 - House - House Roll Call Vote 342 AS AMENDED (Y: 145 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2019-05-09 - Senate - Senate Roll Call Vote 125 (Y: 34 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-10 - Joint - JUD Vote Tally Sheet (Joint Favorable) (Y: 37 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2019-02-08 - Joint - JUD Vote Tally Sheet (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-07-01SenateSigned by the Governor
2019-06-24SenateTransmitted by Secretary of the State to Governor
2019-06-24SenateTransmitted to the Secretary of State
2019-06-20SenatePublic Act 19-110
2019-06-05SenateIn Concurrence
2019-06-05SenateHouse Passed as Amended by Senate Amendment Schedule A
2019-06-05SenateHouse Adopted Senate Amendment Schedule A
2019-05-13SenateHouse Calendar Number 562
2019-05-13SenateFavorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House
2019-05-09SenateOn Consent Calendar
2019-05-09SenateSenate Passed as Amended by Senate Amendment Schedule A
2019-05-09SenateSenate Adopted Senate Amendment Schedule A 8394
2019-04-30SenateFile Number 856
2019-04-30SenateSenate Calendar Number 452
2019-04-30SenateFavorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate
2019-04-30SenateReported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office
2019-04-23SenateReferred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 04/29/19 5:00 PM
2019-04-12SenateFiled with Legislative Commissioners' Office
2019-04-10SenateJoint Favorable
2019-03-21SenatePublic Hearing 03/25
2019-03-19SenateReferred to Joint Committee on Judiciary
2019-03-18SenateDrafted by Committee
2019-02-08SenateVote to Draft
2019-01-24SenateReferred to Joint Committee on Judiciary

Connecticut State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback