CT SB00518 | 2019 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 3-1)
Status: Introduced on January 24 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-05-08 - Referred by Senate to Committee on Finance, Revenue and Bonding
Pending: Joint Finance, Revenue and Bonding Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 24 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-05-08 - Referred by Senate to Committee on Finance, Revenue and Bonding
Pending: Joint Finance, Revenue and Bonding Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Summary
To permit municipalities to provide a property tax abatement for real property used for arts and culture.
Title
An Act Concerning A Municipal Option For Property Tax Abatements For Arts And Culture.
Sponsors
House Planning and Development Committee | Sen. Eric Berthel [R] | Rep. Joe Polletta [R] | Sen. Tony Hwang [R] |
Roll Calls
2019-03-08 - Joint - PD Vote Tally Sheet (Y: 19 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2019-01-30 - Joint - PD Vote Tally Sheet (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-01-30 - Joint - PD Vote Tally Sheet (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-05-08 | Senate | Referred by Senate to Committee on Finance, Revenue and Bonding |
2019-03-21 | Senate | File Number 101 |
2019-03-21 | Senate | Senate Calendar Number 68 |
2019-03-21 | Senate | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate |
2019-03-21 | Senate | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2019-03-15 | Senate | Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 03/20/19 5:00 PM |
2019-03-08 | Senate | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2019-03-08 | Senate | Joint Favorable |
2019-03-01 | Senate | Public Hearing 03/06 |
2019-02-21 | Senate | Referred to Joint Committee on Planning and Development |
2019-02-20 | Senate | Drafted by Committee |
2019-01-30 | Senate | Vote to Draft |
2019-01-24 | Senate | Referred to Joint Committee on Planning and Development |