CT SB00528 | 2018 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Vetoed on June 14 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-06-25 - Senate Reconsidered, Veto Sustained
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Status: Vetoed on June 14 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-06-25 - Senate Reconsidered, Veto Sustained
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
To require the Commissioner of Revenue Services to study the tax policies of the state.
Title
An Act Concerning State Contract Assistance Provided To Certain Municipalities.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-06-25 - Senate - Senate Roll Call Vote 397 REPASS (Y: 17 N: 14 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2018-05-09 - House - House Roll Call Vote 291 SENATE AMD B (Y: 97 N: 48 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-05-09 - House - House Roll Call Vote 292 AS AMENDED (Y: 101 N: 44 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-05-05 - Senate - Senate Roll Call Vote 229 ADOPT SENATE AMD A LCO 4911 (Y: 16 N: 18 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2018-05-05 - Senate - Senate Roll Call Vote 230 ADOPT SENATE AMD B LCO 5398 (Y: 29 N: 5 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-05-05 - Senate - Senate Roll Call Vote 231 PASS AS AMENDED BY SEN B (Y: 28 N: 6 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-04-05 - Joint - FIN Vote Tally Sheet (Y: 51 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-05-09 - House - House Roll Call Vote 291 SENATE AMD B (Y: 97 N: 48 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-05-09 - House - House Roll Call Vote 292 AS AMENDED (Y: 101 N: 44 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-05-05 - Senate - Senate Roll Call Vote 229 ADOPT SENATE AMD A LCO 4911 (Y: 16 N: 18 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2018-05-05 - Senate - Senate Roll Call Vote 230 ADOPT SENATE AMD B LCO 5398 (Y: 29 N: 5 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-05-05 - Senate - Senate Roll Call Vote 231 PASS AS AMENDED BY SEN B (Y: 28 N: 6 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-04-05 - Joint - FIN Vote Tally Sheet (Y: 51 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-06-25 | Senate | Senate Reconsidered, Veto Sustained |
2018-06-25 | Senate | Senate Reconsidered |
2018-06-14 | Senate | Vetoed by the Governor |
2018-05-31 | Senate | Transmitted by Secretary of the State to Governor |
2018-05-31 | Senate | Transmitted to the Secretary of State |
2018-05-25 | Senate | Public Act 18-157 |
2018-05-09 | Senate | In Concurrence |
2018-05-09 | Senate | House Passed as Amended by Senate Amendment Schedule B |
2018-05-09 | Senate | House Adopted Senate Amendment Schedule B |
2018-05-07 | Senate | House Calendar Number 554 |
2018-05-07 | Senate | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House |
2018-05-05 | Senate | Senate Passed as Amended by Senate Amendment Schedule B |
2018-05-05 | Senate | Senate Adopted Senate Amendment Schedule B 5398 |
2018-05-05 | Senate | Senate Rejected Senate Amendment Schedule A 4911 |
2018-04-17 | Senate | File Number 557 |
2018-04-17 | Senate | Senate Calendar Number 342 |
2018-04-17 | Senate | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate |
2018-04-17 | Senate | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2018-04-11 | Senate | Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 04/16/18 5:00 PM |
2018-04-06 | Senate | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2018-04-05 | Senate | Joint Favorable |
2018-03-29 | Senate | Public Hearing 04/02 |
2018-03-28 | Senate | Referred to Joint Committee on Finance, Revenue and Bonding |