CT SB00533 | 2019 | General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Democrat 17-1)
Status: Engrossed on April 17 2019 - 50% progression
Action: 2019-04-18 - House Calendar Number 459
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]

Summary

To amend the State Building Code to require diaper changing tables that are accessible to women and men in all newly constructed or substantially renovated public or commercial buildings that include at least one restroom open to the public.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

An Act Concerning Access To Diaper Changing Stations In Public And Commercial Buildings.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-04-17 - Senate - Senate Roll Call Vote 45 PASS AS AMENDED BY B (Y: 34 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-19 - Joint - PS Vote Tally Sheet (Y: 20 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-02-19 - Joint - PS Vote Tally Sheet (Y: 17 N: 7 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-02-07 - Joint - PS Vote Tally Sheet (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-04-18SenateHouse Calendar Number 459
2019-04-18SenateFavorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House
2019-04-17SenateSenate Passed as Amended by Senate Amendment Schedule A,B
2019-04-17SenateSenate Adopted Senate Amendment Schedule B 7083
2019-04-17SenateSenate Adopted Senate Amendment Schedule A 7126
2019-04-04SenateFile Number 443
2019-04-04SenateSenate Calendar Number 224
2019-04-04SenateFavorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate
2019-04-04SenateReported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office
2019-03-29SenateReferred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 04/03/19 5:00 PM
2019-03-21SenateFiled with Legislative Commissioners' Office
2019-03-19SenateJoint Favorable Substitute
2019-02-27SenateReferred to Joint Committee on Public Safety and Security
2019-02-26SenateDrafted by Committee
2019-02-19SenateVote to Draft
2019-02-08SenatePublic Hearing 02/14
2019-02-07SenateReserved for Subject Matter Public Hearing
2019-01-24SenateReferred to Joint Committee on Public Safety and Security

Connecticut State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback