CT SB00549 | 2019 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-1)
Status: Engrossed on May 8 2019 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-05-10 - House Calendar Number 555
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on May 8 2019 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-05-10 - House Calendar Number 555
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Summary
To eliminate the fifty-six-hour average work week cap for certain firefighters.
Title
An Act Concerning Firefighter Work Weeks.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-05-08 - Senate - Senate Roll Call Vote 104 (Y: 36 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-21 - Joint - LAB Vote Tally Sheet (Y: 10 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-03-05 - Joint - LAB Vote Tally Sheet (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-14 - Joint - LAB Vote Tally Sheet (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-01-30 - Joint - PD Vote Tally Sheet (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-21 - Joint - LAB Vote Tally Sheet (Y: 10 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-03-05 - Joint - LAB Vote Tally Sheet (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-14 - Joint - LAB Vote Tally Sheet (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-01-30 - Joint - PD Vote Tally Sheet (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-05-10 | Senate | House Calendar Number 555 |
2019-05-10 | Senate | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House |
2019-05-08 | Senate | On Consent Calendar |
2019-05-08 | Senate | Senate Passed |
2019-04-04 | Senate | File Number 444 |
2019-04-04 | Senate | Senate Calendar Number 220 |
2019-04-04 | Senate | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate |
2019-04-04 | Senate | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2019-03-29 | Senate | Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 04/03/19 5:00 PM |
2019-03-22 | Senate | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2019-03-21 | Senate | Joint Favorable |
2019-03-19 | Senate | Referred to Joint Committee on Labor and Public Employees |
2019-03-18 | Senate | Drafted by Committee |
2019-03-05 | Senate | Vote to Draft |
2019-02-15 | Senate | Public Hearing 02/21 |
2019-02-14 | Senate | Reserved for Subject Matter Public Hearing |
2019-02-01 | Senate | Change of Reference, House to Committee on Labor and Public Employees |
2019-02-01 | Senate | Change of Reference, Senate to Committee on Labor and Public Employees |
2019-01-30 | Senate | Change of Reference Labor and Public Employees |
2019-01-24 | Senate | Referred to Joint Committee on Planning and Development |