CT SB00570 | 2017 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Introduced on January 23 2017 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2017-03-14 - Referred to Joint Committee on Higher Education and Employment Advancement
Pending: Joint Higher Education and Employment Advancement Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 23 2017 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2017-03-14 - Referred to Joint Committee on Higher Education and Employment Advancement
Pending: Joint Higher Education and Employment Advancement Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Summary
To keep students informed of their student loan debt and available repayment options.
Title
An Act Concerning Loan Information Provided To Students By Institutions Of Higher Education.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-03-02 - Joint - HED Vote Tally Sheet (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-01-26 - Joint - HED Vote Tally Sheet (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-01-26 - Joint - HED Vote Tally Sheet (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-03-14 | Senate | Referred to Joint Committee on Higher Education and Employment Advancement |
2017-03-13 | Senate | Drafted by Committee |
2017-03-02 | Senate | Vote to Draft |
2017-02-17 | Senate | Public Hearing 02/23 |
2017-01-26 | Senate | Reserved for Subject Matter Public Hearing |
2017-01-23 | Senate | Referred to Joint Committee on Higher Education and Employment Advancement |