CT SB00570 | 2019 | General Assembly

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 35-20-1)
Status: Passed on June 21 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-06-21 - Signed by the Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]

Summary

To (1) require the Commissioner of Economic and Community Development to host a series of regional events advertising the state's opportunity zones; (2) require the Commissioner of Economic and Community Development to study how the state may incentivize investment in the state's opportunity zones; and (3) expand the role of the Department of Economic and Community Development's Permit Ombudsman to include expediting review of permit applications for projects that would develop any of the state's opportunity zones.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

An Act Concerning Opportunity Zones.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-06-04 - House - House Roll Call Vote 314 AS AMENDED (Y: 141 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2019-06-03 - Senate - Senate Roll Call Vote 306 (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-31 - Joint - FIN Vote Tally Sheet (Joint Favorable) (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 13) [PASS]
2019-03-19 - Joint - CE Vote Tally Sheet (Y: 19 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2019-02-28 - Joint - CE Vote Tally Sheet (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-06-21HouseSigned by the Governor
2019-06-19HouseTransmitted by Secretary of the State to Governor
2019-06-19HouseTransmitted to the Secretary of State
2019-06-13HousePublic Act 19-54
2019-06-04HouseIn Concurrence
2019-06-04HouseHouse Passed as Amended by Senate Amendment Schedule A,B
2019-06-04HouseHouse Adopted Senate Amendment Schedule B
2019-06-04HouseHouse Adopted Senate Amendment Schedule A
2019-06-03HouseHouse Calendar Number 715
2019-06-03HouseFavorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House
2019-06-03HouseTransmitted Pursuant To Joint Rule 17
2019-06-03SenateOn Consent Calendar
2019-06-03SenateSenate Passed as Amended by Senate Amendment Schedule A,B
2019-06-03SenateSenate Adopted Senate Amendment Schedule B 10444
2019-05-31SenateFavorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate
2019-05-31SenateNo New File by Committee on Finance, Revenue and Bonding
2019-05-31SenateReported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office
2019-05-31SenateFiled with Legislative Commissioners' Office
2019-05-31SenateJoint Favorable
2019-05-28SenateReferred by Senate to Committee on Finance, Revenue and Bonding
2019-05-28SenateSenate Adopted Senate Amendment Schedule A 9888
2019-04-03SenateFile Number 365
2019-04-03SenateSenate Calendar Number 179
2019-04-03SenateFavorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate
2019-04-03SenateReported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office
2019-03-28SenateReferred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 04/02/19 5:00 PM
2019-03-19SenateFiled with Legislative Commissioners' Office
2019-03-19SenateJoint Favorable
2019-03-18SenateReferred to Joint Committee on Commerce
2019-03-15SenateDrafted by Committee
2019-02-28SenateVote to Draft
2019-02-08SenatePublic Hearing 02/14
2019-01-25SenateReferred to Joint Committee on Commerce

Connecticut State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttps://www.cga.ct.gov/asp/cgabillstatus/cgabillstatus.asp?selBillType=Bill&bill_num=SB00570&which_year=2019
Texthttps://www.cga.ct.gov/2019/TOB/s/pdf/2019SB-00570-R00-SB.PDF
Texthttps://www.cga.ct.gov/2019/TOB/s/pdf/2019SB-00570-R01-SB.PDF
Texthttps://www.cga.ct.gov/2019/TOB/s/pdf/2019SB-00570-R02-SB.PDF
Texthttps://www.cga.ct.gov/2019/TOB/s/pdf/2019SB-00570-R03-SB.PDF
Texthttps://www.cga.ct.gov/2019/ACT/pa/pdf/2019PA-00054-R00SB-00570-PA.pdf
Roll Callhttps://www.cga.ct.gov/2019/TS/s/pdf/2019SB-00570-R00CE-CV9-TS.pdf
Roll Callhttps://www.cga.ct.gov/2019/TS/s/pdf/2019SB-00570-R00CE-CV39-TS.pdf
Roll Callhttps://www.cga.ct.gov/2019/TS/s/pdf/2019SB-00570-R00FIN-CV152-TS.pdf
Roll Callhttps://www.cga.ct.gov/2019/VOTE/s/pdf/2019SV-00306-R00SB00570-SV.pdf
Roll Callhttps://www.cga.ct.gov/2019/VOTE/h/pdf/2019HV-00314-R00SB00570-HV.pdf

Bill Comments

feedback