CT SB00585 | 2019 | General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on June 26 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-06-26 - Signed by the Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on June 26 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-06-26 - Signed by the Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
To provide air quality monitoring assistance to towns that may have their air quality affected by the Cricket Valley Energy Center in New York.
Title
An Act Concerning Air Quality Monitoring In Towns Near The Cricket Valley Energy Center.
Sponsors
House Environment Committee | Sen. Julie Kushner [D] | Rep. Maria Horn [D] | Rep. David Michel [D] |
Sen. Craig Miner [R] | Rep. Richard Smith [R] | Rep. Dorinda Keenan Borer [D] | Rep. William Buckbee [R] |
Roll Calls
2019-06-04 - House - House Roll Call Vote 326 (Y: 148 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2019-04-25 - Senate - Senate Roll Call Vote 80 (Y: 33 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-25 - Joint - ENV Vote Tally Sheet (Y: 29 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-11 - Joint - ENV Vote Tally Sheet (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-25 - Senate - Senate Roll Call Vote 80 (Y: 33 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-25 - Joint - ENV Vote Tally Sheet (Y: 29 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-11 - Joint - ENV Vote Tally Sheet (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-06-26 | Senate | Signed by the Governor |
2019-06-17 | Senate | Transmitted by Secretary of the State to Governor |
2019-06-17 | Senate | Transmitted to the Secretary of State |
2019-06-12 | Senate | Public Act 19-29 |
2019-06-04 | Senate | In Concurrence |
2019-06-04 | Senate | House Passed |
2019-04-29 | Senate | House Calendar Number 512 |
2019-04-29 | Senate | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House |
2019-04-25 | Senate | On Consent Calendar |
2019-04-25 | Senate | Senate Passed |
2019-04-11 | Senate | File Number 635 |
2019-04-11 | Senate | Senate Calendar Number 304 |
2019-04-11 | Senate | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate |
2019-04-11 | Senate | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2019-04-05 | Senate | Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 04/10/19 5:00 PM |
2019-03-28 | Senate | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2019-03-25 | Senate | Joint Favorable |
2019-03-13 | Senate | Public Hearing 03/18 |
2019-03-12 | Senate | Referred to Joint Committee on Environment |
2019-03-11 | Senate | Drafted by Committee |
2019-02-11 | Senate | Vote to Draft |
2019-01-25 | Senate | Referred to Joint Committee on Environment |