CT SB00590 | 2019 | General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-1)
Status: Engrossed on May 21 2019 - 50% progression
Action: 2019-05-22 - House Calendar Number 644
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]

Summary

To allow persons who rent state-owned venues in parks and other locations to use the caterer of their own choice.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

An Act Concerning The Selection Of Caterers For Individuals Who Rent State-owned Venues.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-05-21 - Senate - Senate Roll Call Vote 178 ADOPT SENATE AMD A LCO 7410 (Y: 13 N: 22 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2019-05-21 - Senate - Senate Roll Call Vote 179 PASS (Y: 29 N: 6 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-08 - Joint - ENV Vote Tally Sheet (Y: 28 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-02-11 - Joint - ENV Vote Tally Sheet (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-05-22SenateHouse Calendar Number 644
2019-05-22SenateFavorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House
2019-05-21SenateSenate Passed
2019-05-21SenateSenate Rejected Senate Amendment Schedule A 7410
2019-03-25SenateFile Number 127
2019-03-25SenateSenate Calendar Number 78
2019-03-25SenateFavorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate
2019-03-25SenateReported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office
2019-03-18SenateReferred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 03/25/19 10:00 AM
2019-03-12SenateFiled with Legislative Commissioners' Office
2019-03-08SenateJoint Favorable Substitute
2019-02-22SenatePublic Hearing 03/01
2019-02-21SenateReferred to Joint Committee on Environment
2019-02-20SenateDrafted by Committee
2019-02-11SenateVote to Draft
2019-01-25SenateReferred to Joint Committee on Environment

Connecticut State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback