CT SB00598 | 2019 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Democrat 20-1-1)
Status: Introduced on January 25 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-05-08 - Moved to Foot of the Calendar, Senate
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 25 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-05-08 - Moved to Foot of the Calendar, Senate
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Summary
To authorize the production of hemp in Connecticut.
Title
An Act Concerning The Submission Of A Plan For The Production Of Hemp In Connecticut.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-03-08 - Joint - ENV Vote Tally Sheet (Y: 28 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-02-11 - Joint - ENV Vote Tally Sheet (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-11 - Joint - ENV Vote Tally Sheet (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-05-08 | Senate | Moved to Foot of the Calendar, Senate |
2019-03-28 | Senate | File Number 220 |
2019-03-28 | Senate | Senate Calendar Number 119 |
2019-03-28 | Senate | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate |
2019-03-28 | Senate | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2019-03-22 | Senate | Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 03/27/19 5:00 PM |
2019-03-12 | Senate | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2019-03-08 | Senate | Joint Favorable Substitute |
2019-02-22 | Senate | Public Hearing 03/01 |
2019-02-21 | Senate | Referred to Joint Committee on Environment |
2019-02-20 | Senate | Drafted by Committee |
2019-02-11 | Senate | Vote to Draft |
2019-01-25 | Senate | Referred to Joint Committee on Environment |