CT SB00653 | 2019 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 7-1-1)
Status: Engrossed on June 3 2019 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-06-03 - House Calendar Number 716
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on June 3 2019 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-06-03 - House Calendar Number 716
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Summary
To require a more open form of disclosure to defendants in the criminal justice system.
Title
An Act Concerning Open File Disclosure In Criminal Cases.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-06-03 - Senate - Senate Roll Call Vote 307 (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-13 - Joint - APP Vote Tally Sheet (Joint Favorable) (Y: 30 N: 13 NV: 0 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2019-04-09 - Joint - JUD Vote Tally Sheet (Joint Favorable) (Y: 25 N: 15 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-08 - Joint - JUD Vote Tally Sheet (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-13 - Joint - APP Vote Tally Sheet (Joint Favorable) (Y: 30 N: 13 NV: 0 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2019-04-09 - Joint - JUD Vote Tally Sheet (Joint Favorable) (Y: 25 N: 15 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-08 - Joint - JUD Vote Tally Sheet (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-06-03 | House | House Calendar Number 716 |
2019-06-03 | House | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House |
2019-06-03 | House | Transmitted Pursuant To Joint Rule 17 |
2019-06-03 | Senate | On Consent Calendar |
2019-06-03 | Senate | Senate Passed as Amended by Senate Amendment Schedule A |
2019-06-03 | Senate | Senate Adopted Senate Amendment Schedule A 10470 |
2019-05-15 | Senate | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate |
2019-05-15 | Senate | No New File by Committee on Appropriations |
2019-05-15 | Senate | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2019-05-14 | Senate | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2019-05-13 | Senate | Joint Favorable |
2019-05-08 | Senate | Referred by Senate to Committee on Appropriations |
2019-04-29 | Senate | File Number 831 |
2019-04-29 | Senate | Senate Calendar Number 432 |
2019-04-29 | Senate | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate |
2019-04-29 | Senate | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2019-04-22 | Senate | Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 04/29/19 10:00 AM |
2019-04-11 | Senate | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2019-04-09 | Senate | Joint Favorable |
2019-03-25 | Senate | Public Hearing 03/29 |
2019-03-20 | Senate | Referred to Joint Committee on Judiciary |
2019-03-19 | Senate | Drafted by Committee |
2019-02-08 | Senate | Vote to Draft |
2019-01-25 | Senate | Referred to Joint Committee on Judiciary |