CT SB00660 | 2019 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-1)
Status: Introduced on January 25 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-05-15 - Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 25 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-05-15 - Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Summary
To prevent the classification of permanent partial disability settlements as wages for the purpose of workers' compensation benefits.
Title
An Act Concerning Permanent Partial Disability And Pension Offsets.
Sponsors
House Labor and Public Employees Committee | Sen. Julie Kushner [D] | Rep. David Michel [D] | Rep. Michael Winkler [D] |
Rep. Joshua Hall [D] |
Roll Calls
2019-05-13 - Joint - APP Vote Tally Sheet (Joint Favorable) (Y: 29 N: 15 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2019-03-21 - Joint - LAB Vote Tally Sheet (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-03-05 - Joint - LAB Vote Tally Sheet (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-07 - Joint - LAB Vote Tally Sheet (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-21 - Joint - LAB Vote Tally Sheet (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-03-05 - Joint - LAB Vote Tally Sheet (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-07 - Joint - LAB Vote Tally Sheet (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-05-15 | Senate | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate |
2019-05-15 | Senate | No New File by Committee on Appropriations |
2019-05-15 | Senate | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2019-05-14 | Senate | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2019-05-13 | Senate | Joint Favorable |
2019-05-08 | Senate | Referred by Senate to Committee on Appropriations |
2019-04-08 | Senate | File Number 514 |
2019-04-08 | Senate | Senate Calendar Number 251 |
2019-04-08 | Senate | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate |
2019-04-08 | Senate | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2019-04-01 | Senate | Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 04/08/19 10:00 AM |
2019-03-22 | Senate | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2019-03-21 | Senate | Joint Favorable |
2019-03-19 | Senate | Referred to Joint Committee on Labor and Public Employees |
2019-03-18 | Senate | Drafted by Committee |
2019-03-05 | Senate | Vote to Draft |
2019-02-15 | Senate | Public Hearing 02/21 |
2019-02-07 | Senate | Reserved for Subject Matter Public Hearing |
2019-01-25 | Senate | Referred to Joint Committee on Labor and Public Employees |