CT SB00677 | 2019 | General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 9-3-1)
Status: Introduced on January 28 2019 - 25% progression
Action: 2019-03-26 - File Number 157
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]

Summary

To require community antenna television companies and certified competitive video service providers to deliver community access programming in the same format as a subscriber receives primary local broadcast signals.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

An Act Concerning The Delivery Format Of Community Access Programming.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-03-14 - Joint - ET Vote Tally Sheet (Y: 24 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-02-26 - Joint - ET Vote Tally Sheet (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-05 - Joint - ET Vote Tally Sheet (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-03-26SenateFile Number 157
2019-03-26SenateSenate Calendar Number 92
2019-03-26SenateFavorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate
2019-03-26SenateReported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office
2019-03-20SenateReferred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 03/25/19 5:00 PM
2019-03-15SenateFiled with Legislative Commissioners' Office
2019-03-14SenateJoint Favorable
2019-03-13SenateReferred to Joint Committee on Energy and Technology
2019-03-12SenateDrafted by Committee
2019-02-26SenateVote to Draft
2019-02-15SenatePublic Hearing 02/19
2019-02-05SenateReserved for Subject Matter Public Hearing
2019-01-28SenateReferred to Joint Committee on Energy and Technology

Connecticut State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback