CT SB00686 | 2019 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on January 28 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-03-06 - Referred to Joint Committee on Housing
Pending: Joint Housing Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 28 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-03-06 - Referred to Joint Committee on Housing
Pending: Joint Housing Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Summary
To encourage certain recipients of housing assistance to seek vocational or other educational training.
Title
An Act Concerning Housing Assistance.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-02-19 - Joint - HSG Vote Tally Sheet (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-02-05 - Joint - HSG Vote Tally Sheet (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-05 - Joint - HSG Vote Tally Sheet (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-03-06 | Senate | Referred to Joint Committee on Housing |
2019-03-05 | Senate | Drafted by Committee |
2019-02-19 | Senate | Vote to Draft |
2019-02-08 | Senate | Public Hearing 02/14 |
2019-02-05 | Senate | Reserved for Subject Matter Public Hearing |
2019-01-28 | Senate | Referred to Joint Committee on Housing |