CT SB00702 | 2019 | General Assembly

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 7-1-1)
Status: Passed on June 21 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-06-21 - Signed by the Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]

Summary

To protect a law enforcement agency that transfers records to another law enforcement agency from liability if the other agency further discloses such records.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

An Act Concerning The Transfer Of Law Enforcement Agency Records Between Agencies.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-06-04 - House - House Roll Call Vote 316 CONSENT CALENDAR (Y: 149 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2019-05-10 - Senate - Senate Roll Call Vote 135 (Y: 36 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-30 - Joint - JUD Vote Tally Sheet (Joint Favorable) (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2019-03-19 - Joint - PS Vote Tally Sheet (Y: 24 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-02-19 - Joint - PS Vote Tally Sheet (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-07 - Joint - PS Vote Tally Sheet (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-06-21SenateSigned by the Governor
2019-06-17SenateTransmitted by Secretary of the State to Governor
2019-06-17SenateTransmitted to the Secretary of State
2019-06-12SenatePublic Act 19-30
2019-06-04SenateIn Concurrence
2019-06-04SenateOn Consent Calendar
2019-06-04SenateHouse Passed
2019-05-13SenateHouse Calendar Number 577
2019-05-13SenateFavorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House
2019-05-10SenateOn Consent Calendar
2019-05-10SenateSenate Passed
2019-05-01SenateFavorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate
2019-05-01SenateNo New File by Committee on Judiciary
2019-05-01SenateReported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office
2019-05-01SenateFiled with Legislative Commissioners' Office
2019-04-30SenateJoint Favorable
2019-04-24SenateReferred by Senate to Committee on Judiciary
2019-04-08SenateFile Number 515
2019-04-08SenateSenate Calendar Number 259
2019-04-08SenateFavorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate
2019-04-08SenateReported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office
2019-04-01SenateReferred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 04/08/19 10:00 AM
2019-03-21SenateFiled with Legislative Commissioners' Office
2019-03-19SenateJoint Favorable
2019-03-13SenateReferred to Joint Committee on Public Safety and Security
2019-03-12SenateDrafted by Committee
2019-02-19SenateVote to Draft
2019-02-08SenatePublic Hearing 02/14
2019-02-07SenateReserved for Subject Matter Public Hearing
2019-01-28SenateReferred to Joint Committee on Public Safety and Security

Connecticut State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttps://www.cga.ct.gov/asp/cgabillstatus/cgabillstatus.asp?selBillType=Bill&bill_num=SB00702&which_year=2019
Texthttps://www.cga.ct.gov/2019/TOB/s/pdf/2019SB-00702-R00-SB.PDF
Texthttps://www.cga.ct.gov/2019/TOB/s/pdf/2019SB-00702-R01-SB.PDF
Texthttps://www.cga.ct.gov/2019/TOB/s/pdf/2019SB-00702-R02-SB.PDF
Texthttps://www.cga.ct.gov/2019/TOB/s/pdf/2019SB-00702-R03-SB.PDF
Texthttps://www.cga.ct.gov/2019/ACT/pa/pdf/2019PA-00030-R00SB-00702-PA.pdf
Roll Callhttps://www.cga.ct.gov/2019/TS/s/pdf/2019SB-00702-R00PS-CV46-TS.pdf
Roll Callhttps://www.cga.ct.gov/2019/TS/s/pdf/2019SB-00702-R00PS-CV86-TS.pdf
Roll Callhttps://www.cga.ct.gov/2019/TS/s/pdf/2019SB-00702-R00PS-CV152-TS.pdf
Roll Callhttps://www.cga.ct.gov/2019/TS/s/pdf/2019SB-00702-R00JUD-CV215-TS.pdf
Roll Callhttps://www.cga.ct.gov/2019/VOTE/s/pdf/2019SV-00135-R00SB00702-SV.pdf
Roll Callhttps://www.cga.ct.gov/2019/VOTE/h/pdf/2019HV-00316-R00SB00702-HV.pdf

Bill Comments

feedback