CT SB00706 | 2013 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on January 25 2013 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2013-04-04 - Favorable Change of Reference, House to Committee on Finance, Revenue and Bonding
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 25 2013 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2013-04-04 - Favorable Change of Reference, House to Committee on Finance, Revenue and Bonding
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Summary
To provide for staggered terms for directors of the Harbor Point district in Stamford, to ensure a gradual turnover in the governing body of the district.
Title
An Act Concerning The Governing Board Of The Harbor Point District.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-04-04 | Senate | Favorable Change of Reference, House to Committee on Finance, Revenue and Bonding |
2013-04-04 | Senate | Favorable Change of Reference, Senate to Committee on Finance, Revenue and Bonding |
2013-04-03 | Senate | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2013-04-02 | Senate | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2013-04-01 | Senate | Joint Favorable Change of Reference Finance, Revenue and Bonding |
2013-03-25 | Senate | Referred to Joint Committee on Planning and Development |
2013-03-22 | Senate | Drafted by Committee |
2013-03-13 | Senate | Vote to Draft |
2013-02-25 | Senate | Public Hearing 03/01 |
2013-02-15 | Senate | Reserved for Subject Matter Public Hearing |
2013-01-25 | Senate | Referred to Joint Committee on Planning and Development |