CT SB00706 | 2015 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Introduced on January 23 2015 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2015-06-02 - Senate Recommitted to Aging
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 23 2015 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2015-06-02 - Senate Recommitted to Aging
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Summary
To add certified emergency medical technicians to mandated reporters of suspected abuse, neglect, exploitation or abandonment of elderly persons.
Title
An Act Concerning Mandated Reporters Of Elderly Abuse.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-06-02 | Senate | Senate Recommitted to Aging |
2015-06-01 | Senate | Moved to Foot of the Calendar, Senate |
2015-04-29 | Senate | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate |
2015-04-29 | Senate | No New File by Committee on Human Services |
2015-04-29 | Senate | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2015-04-29 | Senate | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2015-04-28 | Senate | Joint Favorable |
2015-04-22 | Senate | Referred by Senate to Committee on Human Services |
2015-04-14 | Senate | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate |
2015-04-14 | Senate | No New File by Committee on Public Health |
2015-04-14 | Senate | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2015-04-14 | Senate | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2015-04-13 | Senate | Joint Favorable |
2015-04-08 | Senate | Referred by Senate to Committee on Public Health |
2015-03-24 | Senate | File Number 198 |
2015-03-24 | Senate | Senate Calendar Number 162 |
2015-03-24 | Senate | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate |
2015-03-24 | Senate | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2015-03-17 | Senate | Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 03/23/15 5:00 PM |
2015-03-09 | Senate | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2015-03-05 | Senate | Joint Favorable Substitute |
2015-01-30 | Senate | Public Hearing 02/05 |
2015-01-23 | Senate | Referred to Joint Committee on Aging |