CT SB00706 | 2019 | General Assembly

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on June 13 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-06-13 - Signed by the Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]

Summary

To increase access to epinephrine auto injectors.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

An Act Concerning Epinephrine Auto Injectors.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-06-01 - House - House Roll Call Vote 269 AS AMENDED (Y: 144 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2019-05-21 - Senate - Senate Roll Call Vote 184 (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-22 - Joint - JUD Vote Tally Sheet (Joint Favorable) (Y: 33 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2019-03-08 - Joint - PH Vote Tally Sheet (Y: 23 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2019-02-08 - Joint - PH Vote Tally Sheet (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-06-13SenateSigned by the Governor
2019-06-06SenateTransmitted by Secretary of the State to Governor
2019-06-06SenateTransmitted to the Secretary of State
2019-06-05SenatePublic Act 19-19
2019-06-01SenateIn Concurrence
2019-06-01SenateHouse Passed as Amended by Senate Amendment Schedule A
2019-06-01SenateHouse Adopted Senate Amendment Schedule A
2019-05-22SenateHouse Calendar Number 645
2019-05-22SenateFavorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House
2019-05-21SenateOn Consent Calendar
2019-05-21SenateSenate Passed as Amended by Senate Amendment Schedule A
2019-05-21SenateSenate Adopted Senate Amendment Schedule A 9080
2019-04-23SenateFavorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate
2019-04-23SenateNo New File by Committee on Judiciary
2019-04-23SenateReported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office
2019-04-23SenateFiled with Legislative Commissioners' Office
2019-04-22SenateJoint Favorable
2019-04-17SenateReferred by Senate to Committee on Judiciary
2019-03-26SenateFile Number 159
2019-03-26SenateSenate Calendar Number 99
2019-03-26SenateFavorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate
2019-03-26SenateReported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office
2019-03-20SenateReferred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 03/25/19 5:00 PM
2019-03-12SenateFiled with Legislative Commissioners' Office
2019-03-08SenateJoint Favorable
2019-02-28SenatePublic Hearing 03/04
2019-02-21SenateReferred to Joint Committee on Public Health
2019-02-20SenateDrafted by Committee
2019-02-08SenateVote to Draft
2019-01-28SenateReferred to Joint Committee on Public Health

Connecticut State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttps://www.cga.ct.gov/asp/cgabillstatus/cgabillstatus.asp?selBillType=Bill&bill_num=SB00706&which_year=2019
Texthttps://www.cga.ct.gov/2019/TOB/s/pdf/2019SB-00706-R00-SB.PDF
Texthttps://www.cga.ct.gov/2019/TOB/s/pdf/2019SB-00706-R01-SB.PDF
Texthttps://www.cga.ct.gov/2019/TOB/s/pdf/2019SB-00706-R02-SB.PDF
Texthttps://www.cga.ct.gov/2019/TOB/s/pdf/2019SB-00706-R03-SB.PDF
Texthttps://www.cga.ct.gov/2019/ACT/pa/pdf/2019PA-00019-R00SB-00706-PA.pdf
Roll Callhttps://www.cga.ct.gov/2019/TS/s/pdf/2019SB-00706-R00PH-CV55-TS.pdf
Roll Callhttps://www.cga.ct.gov/2019/TS/s/pdf/2019SB-00706-R00PH-CV166-TS.pdf
Roll Callhttps://www.cga.ct.gov/2019/TS/s/pdf/2019SB-00706-R00JUD-CV194-TS.pdf
Roll Callhttps://www.cga.ct.gov/2019/VOTE/s/pdf/2019SV-00184-R00SB00706-SV.pdf
Roll Callhttps://www.cga.ct.gov/2019/VOTE/h/pdf/2019HV-00269-R00SB00706-HV.pdf

Bill Comments

feedback