CT SB00709 | 2019 | General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Engrossed on April 25 2019 - 50% progression
Action: 2019-04-29 - House Calendar Number 514
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]

Summary

To create a Division of Cybersecurity within the Department of Emergency Services and Public Protection.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

An Act Establishing A Task Force To Study Cybersecurity.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-04-25 - Senate - Senate Roll Call Vote 78 (Y: 33 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-19 - Joint - PS Vote Tally Sheet (Y: 24 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-02-19 - Joint - PS Vote Tally Sheet (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-07 - Joint - PS Vote Tally Sheet (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-04-29SenateHouse Calendar Number 514
2019-04-29SenateFavorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House
2019-04-25SenateOn Consent Calendar
2019-04-25SenateSenate Passed as Amended by Senate Amendment Schedule A 7536
2019-04-25SenateSenate Adopted Senate Amendment Schedule A 7536
2019-04-08SenateFile Number 516
2019-04-08SenateSenate Calendar Number 260
2019-04-08SenateFavorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate
2019-04-08SenateReported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office
2019-04-01SenateReferred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 04/08/19 10:00 AM
2019-03-21SenateFiled with Legislative Commissioners' Office
2019-03-19SenateJoint Favorable Substitute
2019-03-14SenateReferred to Joint Committee on Public Safety and Security
2019-03-13SenateDrafted by Committee
2019-02-19SenateVote to Draft
2019-02-08SenatePublic Hearing 02/14
2019-02-07SenateReserved for Subject Matter Public Hearing
2019-01-28SenateReferred to Joint Committee on Public Safety and Security

Connecticut State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback