CT SB00745 | 2019 | General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 8-3-1)
Status: Passed on June 21 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-06-21 - Signed by the Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 8-3-1)
Status: Passed on June 21 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-06-21 - Signed by the Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
To require the Board of Regents for Higher Education to conduct a feasibility study on the establishment of computer programming programs related to the controlled environment agricultural industry and the construction of highly technical greenhouses at the regional community-technical colleges.
Title
An Act Requiring A Feasibility Study On The Establishment Of An Environmental Agricultural Program At Public Institutions Of Higher Education.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-06-04 - House - House Roll Call Vote 316 CONSENT CALENDAR (Y: 149 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2019-05-21 - Senate - Senate Roll Call Vote 188 (Y: 34 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-14 - Joint - HED Vote Tally Sheet (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-07 - Joint - HED Vote Tally Sheet (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-21 - Senate - Senate Roll Call Vote 188 (Y: 34 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-14 - Joint - HED Vote Tally Sheet (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-07 - Joint - HED Vote Tally Sheet (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-06-21 | Senate | Signed by the Governor |
2019-06-17 | Senate | Transmitted by Secretary of the State to Governor |
2019-06-17 | Senate | Transmitted to the Secretary of State |
2019-06-12 | Senate | Special Act 19-7 |
2019-06-04 | Senate | In Concurrence |
2019-06-04 | Senate | On Consent Calendar |
2019-06-04 | Senate | House Passed |
2019-05-22 | Senate | House Calendar Number 646 |
2019-05-22 | Senate | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House |
2019-05-21 | Senate | On Consent Calendar |
2019-05-21 | Senate | Senate Passed |
2019-04-02 | Senate | File Number 316 |
2019-04-02 | Senate | Senate Calendar Number 157 |
2019-04-02 | Senate | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate |
2019-04-02 | Senate | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2019-03-27 | Senate | Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 04/01/19 5:00 PM |
2019-03-18 | Senate | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2019-03-14 | Senate | Joint Favorable Substitute |
2019-03-07 | Senate | Referred to Joint Committee on Higher Education and Employment Advancement |
2019-03-06 | Senate | Drafted by Committee |
2019-02-15 | Senate | Public Hearing 02/21 |
2019-02-07 | Senate | Reserved for Subject Matter Public Hearing |
2019-01-29 | Senate | Referred to Joint Committee on Higher Education and Employment Advancement |