CT SB00750 | 2019 | General Assembly

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 20-7-1)
Status: Passed on July 8 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-07-08 - Signed by the Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]

Summary

To create a task force to recommend a state-wide policy for and study the prevention and treatment of mental illness at institutions of higher education in the state.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

An Act Concerning The Prevention And Treatment Of Mental Illness At Institutions Of Higher Education.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-06-05 - House - House Roll Call Vote 382 (Y: 150 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-04-17 - Senate - Senate Roll Call Vote 48 (Y: 36 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-14 - Joint - HED Vote Tally Sheet (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-01-31 - Joint - HED Vote Tally Sheet (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-07-08SenateSigned by the Governor
2019-06-24SenateTransmitted by Secretary of the State to Governor
2019-06-24SenateTransmitted to the Secretary of State
2019-06-19SenateSpecial Act 19-14
2019-06-05SenateIn Concurrence
2019-06-05SenateHouse Passed
2019-04-18SenateHouse Calendar Number 461
2019-04-18SenateFavorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House
2019-04-17SenateOn Consent Calendar
2019-04-17SenateSenate Passed
2019-03-28SenateFile Number 222
2019-03-28SenateSenate Calendar Number 121
2019-03-28SenateFavorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate
2019-03-28SenateReported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office
2019-03-22SenateReferred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 03/27/19 5:00 PM
2019-03-18SenateFiled with Legislative Commissioners' Office
2019-03-14SenateJoint Favorable
2019-03-13SenateReferred to Joint Committee on Higher Education and Employment Advancement
2019-03-12SenateDrafted by Committee
2019-02-08SenatePublic Hearing 02/14
2019-01-31SenateReserved for Subject Matter Public Hearing
2019-01-29SenateReferred to Joint Committee on Higher Education and Employment Advancement

Connecticut State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback