CT SB00752 | 2019 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-1)
Status: Engrossed on May 29 2019 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-06-05 - Bill Passed Temporarily
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on May 29 2019 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-06-05 - Bill Passed Temporarily
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Summary
To prohibit smoking and vaping on beaches in state parks.
Title
An Act Concerning Smoking And Vaping On Beaches In State Parks.
Sponsors
House Environment Committee | Rep. Joshua Elliott [D] | Sen. Alexandra Kasser [D] | Sen. Saud Anwar [D] |
Sen. Mae Flexer [D] | Rep. Robin Comey [D] | Rep. Henry Genga [D] |
Roll Calls
2019-05-29 - Senate - Senate Roll Call Vote 247 PASS AS AMENDED BY SEN A & B (Y: 33 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-28 - Joint - APP Vote Tally Sheet (Joint Favorable) (Y: 39 N: 9 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2019-02-25 - Joint - ENV Vote Tally Sheet (Y: 25 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-05-28 - Joint - APP Vote Tally Sheet (Joint Favorable) (Y: 39 N: 9 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2019-02-25 - Joint - ENV Vote Tally Sheet (Y: 25 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-06-05 | Senate | Bill Passed Temporarily |
2019-05-31 | Senate | House Calendar Number 685 |
2019-05-31 | Senate | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House |
2019-05-29 | Senate | Senate Passed as Amended by Senate Amendment Schedule A,B |
2019-05-29 | Senate | Senate Adopted Senate Amendment Schedule B 9846 |
2019-05-29 | Senate | Senate Adopted Senate Amendment Schedule A 8751 |
2019-05-28 | Senate | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate |
2019-05-28 | Senate | No New File by Committee on Appropriations |
2019-05-28 | Senate | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2019-05-28 | Senate | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2019-05-28 | Senate | Joint Favorable |
2019-05-23 | Senate | Referred by Senate to Committee on Appropriations |
2019-03-13 | Senate | File Number 55 |
2019-03-13 | Senate | Senate Calendar Number 50 |
2019-03-13 | Senate | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate |
2019-03-13 | Senate | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2019-03-07 | Senate | Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 03/12/19 5:00 PM |
2019-02-26 | Senate | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2019-02-25 | Senate | Joint Favorable Substitute |
2019-01-30 | Senate | Public Hearing 02/04 |
2019-01-29 | Senate | Referred to Joint Committee on Environment |