CT SB00761 | 2019 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Democrat 10-1)
Status: Engrossed on May 28 2019 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-05-30 - House Calendar Number 674
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on May 28 2019 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-05-30 - House Calendar Number 674
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Summary
To: (1) Require an employer to provide honest recommendations and commenting to a prospective employer about any act of sexual harassment or sexual assault by a current or former employer, and (2) prohibit employers from requiring an employee to enter into a contract that prevents the employee from disclosing discrimination that occurs in the workplace.
Title
An Act Promoting The Use Of Honest Recommendations Between Employers And Prohibiting An Employer's Use Of A Nondisclosure Agreement Relating To Acts Of Discrimination Occurring In The Employer's Workplace.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-05-28 - Senate - Senate Roll Call Vote 237 ADOPT SENATE AMD B LCO 8637 (Y: 14 N: 21 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2019-05-28 - Senate - Senate Roll Call Vote 242 PASS AS AMENDED BY SEN A (Y: 33 N: 2 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-10 - Joint - JUD Vote Tally Sheet (Joint Favorable Substitute) (Y: 29 N: 10 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-02-15 - Joint - JUD Vote Tally Sheet (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-28 - Senate - Senate Roll Call Vote 242 PASS AS AMENDED BY SEN A (Y: 33 N: 2 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-10 - Joint - JUD Vote Tally Sheet (Joint Favorable Substitute) (Y: 29 N: 10 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-02-15 - Joint - JUD Vote Tally Sheet (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-05-30 | Senate | House Calendar Number 674 |
2019-05-30 | Senate | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House |
2019-05-28 | Senate | Senate Passed as Amended by Senate Amendment Schedule A |
2019-05-28 | Senate | Senate Rejected Senate Amendment Schedule B 8637 |
2019-05-28 | Senate | Senate Adopted Senate Amendment Schedule A 9542 |
2019-04-30 | Senate | File Number 857 |
2019-04-30 | Senate | Senate Calendar Number 453 |
2019-04-30 | Senate | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate |
2019-04-30 | Senate | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2019-04-23 | Senate | Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 04/29/19 5:00 PM |
2019-04-12 | Senate | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2019-04-10 | Senate | Joint Favorable Substitute |
2019-03-25 | Senate | Public Hearing 03/29 |
2019-03-15 | Senate | Referred to Joint Committee on Judiciary |
2019-03-14 | Senate | Drafted by Committee |
2019-02-15 | Senate | Vote to Draft |
2019-01-29 | Senate | Referred to Joint Committee on Judiciary |