CT SB00764 | 2019 | General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 23-1)
Status: Introduced on January 29 2019 - 25% progression
Action: 2019-04-08 - File Number 518
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]

Summary

To prohibit the practice of on-call shift scheduling.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

An Act Limiting "on-call" Shift Scheduling.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-03-21 - Joint - LAB Vote Tally Sheet (Y: 9 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-02-07 - Joint - LAB Vote Tally Sheet (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-04-08SenateFile Number 518
2019-04-08SenateSenate Calendar Number 252
2019-04-08SenateFavorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate
2019-04-08SenateReported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office
2019-04-01SenateReferred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 04/08/19 10:00 AM
2019-03-22SenateFiled with Legislative Commissioners' Office
2019-03-21SenateJoint Favorable Substitute
2019-03-01SenatePublic Hearing 03/07
2019-02-27SenateReferred to Joint Committee on Labor and Public Employees
2019-02-26SenateDrafted by Committee
2019-02-07SenateVote to Draft
2019-01-29SenateReferred to Joint Committee on Labor and Public Employees

Connecticut State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback