CT SB00765 | 2019 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 23-1)
Status: Engrossed on May 30 2019 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-06-01 - House Calendar Number 694
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on May 30 2019 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-06-01 - House Calendar Number 694
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Summary
To ensure all employees receive fair and equal pay for equal work.
Title
An Act Ensuring Fair And Equal Pay For Equal Work.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-05-30 - Senate - Senate Roll Call Vote 261 PASS AS AMENDED BY SEN A (Y: 34 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-13 - Joint - JUD Vote Tally Sheet (Joint Favorable) (Y: 26 N: 9 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2019-03-21 - Joint - LAB Vote Tally Sheet (Y: 11 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2019-03-05 - Joint - LAB Vote Tally Sheet (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-07 - Joint - LAB Vote Tally Sheet (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-13 - Joint - JUD Vote Tally Sheet (Joint Favorable) (Y: 26 N: 9 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2019-03-21 - Joint - LAB Vote Tally Sheet (Y: 11 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2019-03-05 - Joint - LAB Vote Tally Sheet (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-07 - Joint - LAB Vote Tally Sheet (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-06-01 | Senate | House Calendar Number 694 |
2019-06-01 | Senate | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House |
2019-05-30 | Senate | Senate Passed as Amended by Senate Amendment Schedule A |
2019-05-30 | Senate | Senate Adopted Senate Amendment Schedule A 9581 |
2019-05-14 | Senate | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate |
2019-05-14 | Senate | No New File by Committee on Judiciary |
2019-05-14 | Senate | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2019-05-14 | Senate | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2019-05-13 | Senate | Joint Favorable |
2019-05-09 | Senate | Referred by Senate to Committee on Judiciary |
2019-04-08 | Senate | File Number 519 |
2019-04-08 | Senate | Senate Calendar Number 253 |
2019-04-08 | Senate | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate |
2019-04-08 | Senate | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2019-04-01 | Senate | Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 04/08/19 10:00 AM |
2019-03-22 | Senate | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2019-03-21 | Senate | Joint Favorable |
2019-03-19 | Senate | Referred to Joint Committee on Labor and Public Employees |
2019-03-18 | Senate | Drafted by Committee |
2019-03-05 | Senate | Vote to Draft |
2019-02-08 | Senate | Public Hearing 02/14 |
2019-02-07 | Senate | Reserved for Subject Matter Public Hearing |
2019-01-29 | Senate | Referred to Joint Committee on Labor and Public Employees |