CT SB00777 | 2019 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Engrossed on May 9 2019 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-05-13 - House Calendar Number 564
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on May 9 2019 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-05-13 - House Calendar Number 564
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Summary
To study tax abatements available to veterans in this state.
Title
An Act Requiring A Study Of Veterans' Tax Abatements.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-05-09 - Senate - Senate Roll Call Vote 118 (Y: 34 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-12 - Joint - VA Vote Tally Sheet (Y: 16 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-02-19 - Joint - VA Vote Tally Sheet (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-05 - Joint - VA Vote Tally Sheet (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-12 - Joint - VA Vote Tally Sheet (Y: 16 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-02-19 - Joint - VA Vote Tally Sheet (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-05 - Joint - VA Vote Tally Sheet (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-05-13 | Senate | House Calendar Number 564 |
2019-05-13 | Senate | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House |
2019-05-09 | Senate | On Consent Calendar |
2019-05-09 | Senate | Senate Passed as Amended by Senate Amendment Schedule A |
2019-05-09 | Senate | Senate Adopted Senate Amendment Schedule A 8222 |
2019-03-26 | Senate | File Number 160 |
2019-03-26 | Senate | Senate Calendar Number 100 |
2019-03-26 | Senate | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate |
2019-03-26 | Senate | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2019-03-20 | Senate | Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 03/25/19 5:00 PM |
2019-03-13 | Senate | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2019-03-12 | Senate | Joint Favorable |
2019-02-28 | Senate | Referred to Joint Committee on Veterans' Affairs |
2019-02-27 | Senate | Drafted by Committee |
2019-02-19 | Senate | Vote to Draft |
2019-02-08 | Senate | Public Hearing 02/14 |
2019-02-05 | Senate | Reserved for Subject Matter Public Hearing |
2019-01-29 | Senate | Referred to Joint Committee on Veterans' Affairs |