CT SB00789 | 2019 | General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Democrat 11-1)
Status: Introduced on January 29 2019 - 25% progression
Action: 2019-04-04 - File Number 448
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]

Summary

To prohibit a law enforcement unit from requiring a police officer to pay any portion of the costs of the officer's certification that the law enforcement unit must pay to another unit.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

An Act Concerning Reimbursement To Law Enforcement Units For Training Costs.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-03-19 - Joint - PS Vote Tally Sheet (Y: 18 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-02-28 - Joint - PS Vote Tally Sheet (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-07 - Joint - PS Vote Tally Sheet (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-04-04SenateFile Number 448
2019-04-04SenateSenate Calendar Number 225
2019-04-04SenateFavorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate
2019-04-04SenateReported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office
2019-03-29SenateReferred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 04/03/19 5:00 PM
2019-03-21SenateFiled with Legislative Commissioners' Office
2019-03-19SenateJoint Favorable
2019-03-18SenateReferred to Joint Committee on Public Safety and Security
2019-03-15SenateDrafted by Committee
2019-02-28SenateVote to Draft
2019-02-08SenatePublic Hearing 02/14
2019-02-07SenateReserved for Subject Matter Public Hearing
2019-01-29SenateReferred to Joint Committee on Public Safety and Security

Connecticut State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback