CT SB00800 | 2019 | General Assembly

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 14-6-1)
Status: Passed on June 28 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-06-28 - Signed by the Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]

Summary

To establish a medal of merit for civilians.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

An Act Establishing The Medal Of Merit For Civilians.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-06-04 - House - House Roll Call Vote 321 AS AMENDED (Y: 150 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-04-24 - Senate - Senate Roll Call Vote 70 (Y: 29 N: 0 NV: 7 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-19 - Joint - VA Vote Tally Sheet (Y: 16 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-06-28SenateSigned by the Governor
2019-06-19SenateTransmitted by Secretary of the State to Governor
2019-06-19SenateTransmitted to the Secretary of State
2019-06-13SenatePublic Act 19-55
2019-06-04SenateIn Concurrence
2019-06-04SenateHouse Passed as Amended by Senate Amendment Schedule A
2019-06-04SenateHouse Adopted Senate Amendment Schedule A
2019-04-26SenateHouse Calendar Number 503
2019-04-26SenateFavorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House
2019-04-24SenateOn Consent Calendar
2019-04-24SenateSenate Passed as Amended by Senate Amendment Schedule A
2019-04-24SenateSenate Adopted Senate Amendment Schedule A 7457
2019-03-07SenateFile Number 37
2019-03-07SenateSenate Calendar Number 42
2019-03-07SenateFavorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate
2019-03-07SenateReported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office
2019-03-01SenateReferred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 03/06/19 5:00 PM
2019-02-20SenateFiled with Legislative Commissioners' Office
2019-02-19SenateJoint Favorable
2019-02-08SenatePublic Hearing 02/14
2019-01-31SenateReferred to Joint Committee on Veterans' Affairs

Connecticut State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback