CT SB00804 | 2019 | General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on July 1 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-07-01 - Signed by the Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on July 1 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-07-01 - Signed by the Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
To expand the investigatory oversight of the State Ombudsman to include home and community-based services.
Title
An Act Concerning A Community Ombudsman.
Sponsors
House Aging Committee | Sen. Tony Hwang [R] | Rep. Catherine Abercrombie [D] | Rep. Henry Genga [D] |
Sen. Kevin Kelly [R] | Rep. Joseph Serra [D] |
Roll Calls
2019-06-05 - House - House Roll Call Vote 374 CONSENT CALENDAR (Y: 150 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-05-17 - Senate - Senate Roll Call Vote 169 (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-26 - Joint - AGE Vote Tally Sheet (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2019-05-17 - Senate - Senate Roll Call Vote 169 (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-26 - Joint - AGE Vote Tally Sheet (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-07-01 | Senate | Signed by the Governor |
2019-06-24 | Senate | Transmitted by Secretary of the State to Governor |
2019-06-24 | Senate | Transmitted to the Secretary of State |
2019-06-20 | Senate | Special Act 19-18 |
2019-06-05 | Senate | In Concurrence |
2019-06-05 | Senate | On Consent Calendar |
2019-06-05 | Senate | House Passed as Amended by Senate Amendment Schedule A |
2019-06-05 | Senate | House Adopted Senate Amendment Schedule A |
2019-05-17 | Senate | House Calendar Number 614 |
2019-05-17 | Senate | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House |
2019-05-16 | Senate | On Consent Calendar |
2019-05-16 | Senate | Senate Passed as Amended by Senate Amendment Schedule A |
2019-05-16 | Senate | Senate Adopted Senate Amendment Schedule A 8530 |
2019-03-07 | Senate | File Number 39 |
2019-03-07 | Senate | Senate Calendar Number 38 |
2019-03-07 | Senate | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate |
2019-03-07 | Senate | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2019-03-01 | Senate | Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 03/06/19 5:00 PM |
2019-02-27 | Senate | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2019-02-26 | Senate | Joint Favorable Substitute |
2019-02-13 | Senate | Public Hearing 02/19 |
2019-02-06 | Senate | Referred to Joint Committee on Aging |