CT SB00805 | 2019 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on February 6 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-05-08 - Referred by Senate to Committee on Appropriations
Pending: Joint Appropriations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 6 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-05-08 - Referred by Senate to Committee on Appropriations
Pending: Joint Appropriations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Summary
To assist financially distressed elderly homeowners.
Title
An Act Establishing A Revolving Loan Fund To Assist Elderly Homeowners.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-02-26 - Joint - AGE Vote Tally Sheet (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-05-08 | Senate | Referred by Senate to Committee on Appropriations |
2019-03-07 | Senate | File Number 40 |
2019-03-07 | Senate | Senate Calendar Number 39 |
2019-03-07 | Senate | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate |
2019-03-07 | Senate | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2019-03-01 | Senate | Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 03/06/19 5:00 PM |
2019-02-27 | Senate | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2019-02-26 | Senate | Joint Favorable |
2019-02-13 | Senate | Public Hearing 02/19 |
2019-02-06 | Senate | Referred to Joint Committee on Aging |