CT SB00806 | 2019 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on February 6 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-05-13 - No Action
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 6 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-05-13 - No Action
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Summary
To prohibit a finding of neglect if the allegation of neglect is based solely on a child's participation in independent activities and such child is of sufficient maturity, physical condition and mental ability to avoid engaging in conduct that carries a substantial risk of physical harm.
Title
An Act Prohibiting A Finding Of Neglect In Certain Circumstances.
Sponsors
House Committee on Children | Rep. Tom O'Dea [R] | Sen. Will Haskell [D] | Rep. Gail Lavielle [R] |
Rep. Lucy Dathan [D] | Rep. Travis Simms [D] |
Roll Calls
2019-03-07 - Joint - KID Vote Tally Sheet (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-05-13 | Senate | No Action |
2019-05-09 | Senate | Referred by Senate to Committee on Judiciary |
2019-05-09 | Senate | Senate Adopted Senate Amendment Schedule A 7729 |
2019-03-25 | Senate | File Number 130 |
2019-03-25 | Senate | Senate Calendar Number 81 |
2019-03-25 | Senate | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate |
2019-03-25 | Senate | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2019-03-18 | Senate | Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 03/25/19 10:00 AM |
2019-03-08 | Senate | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2019-03-07 | Senate | Joint Favorable Substitute |
2019-02-08 | Senate | Public Hearing 02/14 |
2019-02-06 | Senate | Referred to Joint Committee on Children |