CT SB00812 | 2019 | General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on June 26 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-06-26 - Signed by the Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on June 26 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-06-26 - Signed by the Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
To make technical revisions to the education and early childhood statutes.
Title
An Act Concerning The Legislative Commissioners' Recommendations For Technical Revisions To The Education And Early Childhood Statutes.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-06-04 - House - House Roll Call Vote 316 CONSENT CALENDAR (Y: 149 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2019-04-17 - Senate - Senate Roll Call Vote 50 (Y: 36 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-15 - Joint - ED Vote Tally Sheet (Y: 33 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2019-04-17 - Senate - Senate Roll Call Vote 50 (Y: 36 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-15 - Joint - ED Vote Tally Sheet (Y: 33 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-06-26 | Senate | Signed by the Governor |
2019-06-17 | Senate | Transmitted by Secretary of the State to Governor |
2019-06-17 | Senate | Transmitted to the Secretary of State |
2019-06-12 | Senate | Public Act 19-31 |
2019-06-04 | Senate | In Concurrence |
2019-06-04 | Senate | On Consent Calendar |
2019-06-04 | Senate | House Passed |
2019-04-18 | Senate | House Calendar Number 464 |
2019-04-18 | Senate | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House |
2019-04-17 | Senate | On Consent Calendar |
2019-04-17 | Senate | Senate Passed |
2019-04-02 | Senate | File Number 318 |
2019-04-02 | Senate | Senate Calendar Number 147 |
2019-04-02 | Senate | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate |
2019-04-02 | Senate | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2019-03-27 | Senate | Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 04/01/19 5:00 PM |
2019-03-18 | Senate | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2019-03-15 | Senate | Joint Favorable |
2019-03-01 | Senate | Public Hearing 03/06 |
2019-02-07 | Senate | Referred to Joint Committee on Education |