CT SB00814 | 2019 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on February 7 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-03-12 - Favorable Change of Reference, House to Committee on Public Health
Pending: Joint Public Health Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 7 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-03-12 - Favorable Change of Reference, House to Committee on Public Health
Pending: Joint Public Health Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Summary
To require each local and regional board of education to conduct a test of the water supply for any school building or facility constructed before July 1, 1986, for the presence of lead.
Title
An Act Requiring Boards Of Education To Conduct Testing Of Water Supplies In Public Schools For The Presence Of Lead.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-03-06 - Joint - ED Vote Tally Sheet (Y: 36 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-03-12 | Senate | Favorable Change of Reference, House to Committee on Public Health |
2019-03-11 | Senate | Favorable Change of Reference, Senate to Committee on Public Health |
2019-03-08 | Senate | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2019-03-07 | Senate | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2019-03-06 | Senate | Joint Favorable Change of Reference Public Health |
2019-02-15 | Senate | Public Hearing 02/22 |
2019-02-07 | Senate | Referred to Joint Committee on Education |