CT SB00827 | 2019 | General Assembly

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on July 1 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-07-01 - Signed by the Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]

Summary

To require certain health care professionals who provide primary care or emergency treatment for adults to receive training in recognizing the signs and symptoms of Alzheimer's disease and dementia and to establish a working group to develop recommendations on improving the care of Alzheimer's disease and dementia patients.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

An Act Concerning Alzheimer's Disease And Dementia Training And Best Practices.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-06-05 - House - House Roll Call Vote 353 AS AMENDED (Y: 150 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-04-24 - Senate - Senate Roll Call Vote 60 PASS SENATE AMD A LCO 7372 (Y: 24 N: 8 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-24 - Senate - Senate Roll Call Vote 62 (Y: 32 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-26 - Joint - AGE Vote Tally Sheet (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-07-01SenateSigned by the Governor
2019-06-24SenateTransmitted by Secretary of the State to Governor
2019-06-24SenateTransmitted to the Secretary of State
2019-06-20SenatePublic Act 19-115
2019-06-05SenateIn Concurrence
2019-06-05SenateHouse Passed as Amended by Senate Amendment Schedule A
2019-06-05SenateHouse Adopted Senate Amendment Schedule A
2019-04-26SenateHouse Calendar Number 504
2019-04-26SenateFavorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House
2019-04-24SenateOn Consent Calendar
2019-04-24SenateSenate Passed as Amended by Senate Amendment Schedule A
2019-04-24SenateSenate Adopted Senate Amendment Schedule A 7372
2019-03-07SenateFile Number 41
2019-03-07SenateSenate Calendar Number 40
2019-03-07SenateFavorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate
2019-03-07SenateReported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office
2019-03-01SenateReferred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 03/06/19 5:00 PM
2019-02-27SenateFiled with Legislative Commissioners' Office
2019-02-26SenateJoint Favorable Substitute
2019-02-13SenatePublic Hearing 02/19
2019-02-08SenateReferred to Joint Committee on Aging

Connecticut State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback