CT SB00831 | 2019 | General Assembly

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum:
Status: Passed on July 1 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-07-01 - Signed by the Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]

Summary

To make minor revisions to the early parole discharge statutes and conforming changes with public act 18-63.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

An Act Concerning Minor Revisions To Special Parole And Parole Discharge Statutes.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-06-05 - House - House Roll Call Vote 333 (Y: 146 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2019-05-17 - Senate - Senate Roll Call Vote 173 (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-10 - Joint - JUD Vote Tally Sheet (Joint Favorable Substitute) (Y: 37 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-07-01SenateSigned by the Governor
2019-06-24SenateTransmitted by Secretary of the State to Governor
2019-06-24SenateTransmitted to the Secretary of State
2019-06-19SenatePublic Act 19-84
2019-06-05SenateIn Concurrence
2019-06-05SenateHouse Passed
2019-05-17SenateHouse Calendar Number 615
2019-05-17SenateFavorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House
2019-05-16SenateOn Consent Calendar
2019-05-16SenateSenate Passed
2019-04-29SenateFile Number 834
2019-04-29SenateSenate Calendar Number 435
2019-04-29SenateFavorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate
2019-04-29SenateReported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office
2019-04-22SenateReferred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 04/29/19 10:00 AM
2019-04-12SenateFiled with Legislative Commissioners' Office
2019-04-10SenateJoint Favorable Substitute
2019-02-11SenatePublic Hearing 02/15
2019-02-08SenateReferred to Joint Committee on Judiciary

Connecticut State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback