CT SB00832 | 2019 | General Assembly

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on July 1 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-07-01 - Signed by the Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]

Summary

To provide the public with access to a searchable database of perpetrators of crimes and other substantiated abuse, neglect, exploitation or abandonment of elderly persons or persons with disabilities.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

An Act Concerning Registries Of Persons Found Responsible For Assaults Or Other Abuse, Neglect, Exploitation Or Abandonment Of Elderly Persons Or Persons With Disabilities.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-06-05 - House - House Roll Call Vote 374 CONSENT CALENDAR (Y: 150 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-04-24 - Senate - Senate Roll Call Vote 63 (Y: 32 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-26 - Joint - AGE Vote Tally Sheet (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-07-01SenateSigned by the Governor
2019-06-24SenateTransmitted by Secretary of the State to Governor
2019-06-24SenateTransmitted to the Secretary of State
2019-06-20SenatePublic Act 19-116
2019-06-05SenateIn Concurrence
2019-06-05SenateOn Consent Calendar
2019-06-05SenateHouse Passed as Amended by Senate Amendment Schedule A
2019-06-05SenateHouse Adopted Senate Amendment Schedule A
2019-04-26SenateHouse Calendar Number 505
2019-04-26SenateFavorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House
2019-04-24SenateOn Consent Calendar
2019-04-24SenateSenate Passed as Amended by Senate Amendment Schedule A
2019-04-24SenateSenate Adopted Senate Amendment Schedule A 7379
2019-03-13SenateFile Number 59
2019-03-13SenateSenate Calendar Number 54
2019-03-13SenateFavorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate
2019-03-13SenateReported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office
2019-03-07SenateReferred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 03/12/19 5:00 PM
2019-02-27SenateFiled with Legislative Commissioners' Office
2019-02-26SenateJoint Favorable
2019-02-13SenatePublic Hearing 02/19
2019-02-08SenateReferred to Joint Committee on Aging

Connecticut State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback