CT SB00837 | 2019 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on February 14 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-04-17 - Moved to Foot of the Calendar, Senate
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 14 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-04-17 - Moved to Foot of the Calendar, Senate
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Summary
To ensure parity in Medicaid payment for nurse-midwives and obstetrician-gynecologists who perform the same services.
Title
An Act Concerning Medicaid Payment Rates For Nurse-midwives.
Sponsors
House Human Services Committee | Rep. Travis Simms [D] | Rep. Jillian Gilchrest [D] | Sen. John Kissel [R] |
Sen. Kevin Witkos [R] | Sen. Kevin Kelly [R] | Sen. George Logan [R] |
Roll Calls
2019-03-07 - Joint - HS Vote Tally Sheet (Y: 17 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-04-17 | Senate | Moved to Foot of the Calendar, Senate |
2019-03-21 | Senate | File Number 105 |
2019-03-21 | Senate | Senate Calendar Number 72 |
2019-03-21 | Senate | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate |
2019-03-21 | Senate | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2019-03-15 | Senate | Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 03/20/19 5:00 PM |
2019-03-07 | Senate | Joint Favorable |
2019-03-07 | Senate | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2019-02-22 | Senate | Public Hearing 02/28 |
2019-02-14 | Senate | Referred to Joint Committee on Human Services |