CT SB00843 | 2019 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 5-1-1)
Status: Engrossed on May 9 2019 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-05-13 - House Calendar Number 566
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on May 9 2019 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-05-13 - House Calendar Number 566
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Summary
To elevate the penalty for dissemination of intimate images in the case of dissemination to multiple persons by certain electronic means.
Title
An Act Concerning The Unlawful Dissemination Of Intimate Images.
Sponsors
House Judiciary Committee | Rep. Patrick Boyd [D] | Sen. Kevin Witkos [R] | Sen. John Kissel [R] |
Sen. Kevin Kelly [R] | Sen. George Logan [R] | Sen. Gennaro Bizzarro [R] |
Roll Calls
2019-05-09 - Senate - Senate Roll Call Vote 122 (Y: 34 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-09 - Joint - JUD Vote Tally Sheet (Joint Favorable) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-09 - Joint - JUD Vote Tally Sheet (Joint Favorable) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-05-13 | Senate | House Calendar Number 566 |
2019-05-13 | Senate | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House |
2019-05-09 | Senate | On Consent Calendar |
2019-05-09 | Senate | Senate Passed |
2019-04-25 | Senate | File Number 796 |
2019-04-25 | Senate | Senate Calendar Number 388 |
2019-04-25 | Senate | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate |
2019-04-25 | Senate | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2019-04-18 | Senate | Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 04/24/19 5:00 PM |
2019-04-11 | Senate | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2019-04-09 | Senate | Joint Favorable |
2019-02-15 | Senate | Public Hearing 02/22 |
2019-02-14 | Senate | Referred to Joint Committee on Judiciary |