CT SB00848 | 2019 | General Assembly

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on July 3 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-07-03 - Signed by the Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]

Summary

To remove a dollar cap regarding irrevocable funeral service contracts and to allow for the sale of a crypt or room in a mausoleum or niche in a columbarium before construction of the structure is completed.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

An Act Concerning Funeral Service Contracts And Cemeteries.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-06-04 - House - House Roll Call Vote 323 AS AMENDED (Y: 150 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-05-30 - Senate - Senate Roll Call Vote 263 (Y: 36 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-05 - Joint - GL Vote Tally Sheet (Y: 16 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-07-03SenateSigned by the Governor
2019-06-19SenateTransmitted by Secretary of the State to Governor
2019-06-19SenateTransmitted to the Secretary of State
2019-06-13SenatePublic Act 19-57
2019-06-04SenateIn Concurrence
2019-06-04SenateHouse Passed as Amended by Senate Amendment Schedule A
2019-06-04SenateHouse Adopted Senate Amendment Schedule A
2019-06-01SenateHouse Calendar Number 695
2019-06-01SenateFavorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House
2019-05-30SenateOn Consent Calendar
2019-05-30SenateSenate Passed as Amended by Senate Amendment Schedule A
2019-05-30SenateSenate Adopted Senate Amendment Schedule A 10111
2019-03-19SenateFile Number 76
2019-03-19SenateSenate Calendar Number 63
2019-03-19SenateFavorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate
2019-03-19SenateReported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office
2019-03-12SenateReferred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 03/18/19 5:00 PM
2019-03-06SenateFiled with Legislative Commissioners' Office
2019-03-05SenateJoint Favorable
2019-02-15SenatePublic Hearing 02/19
2019-02-14SenateReferred to Joint Committee on General Law

Connecticut State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback