CT SB00859 | 2019 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-1-1)
Status: Engrossed on May 21 2019 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-05-22 - House Calendar Number 648
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on May 21 2019 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-05-22 - House Calendar Number 648
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Summary
To require the establishment of a certification program for community health workers.
Title
An Act Concerning Community Health Workers.
Sponsors
House Public Health Committee | Sen. Saud Anwar [D] | Rep. David Michel [D] | Rep. Quentin Williams [D] |
Sen. Marilyn Moore [D] | Rep. Christine Conley [D] | Rep. Kathleen McCarty [R] |
Roll Calls
2019-05-21 - Senate - Senate Roll Call Vote 196 (Y: 34 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-13 - Joint - APP Vote Tally Sheet (Joint Favorable) (Y: 36 N: 9 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2019-03-29 - Joint - PH Vote Tally Sheet (Y: 25 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-13 - Joint - APP Vote Tally Sheet (Joint Favorable) (Y: 36 N: 9 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2019-03-29 - Joint - PH Vote Tally Sheet (Y: 25 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-05-22 | Senate | House Calendar Number 648 |
2019-05-22 | Senate | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House |
2019-05-21 | Senate | On Consent Calendar |
2019-05-21 | Senate | Senate Passed as Amended by Senate Amendment Schedule A,B |
2019-05-21 | Senate | Senate Adopted Senate Amendment Schedule B 9076 |
2019-05-15 | Senate | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate |
2019-05-15 | Senate | No New File by Committee on Appropriations |
2019-05-15 | Senate | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2019-05-14 | Senate | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2019-05-13 | Senate | Joint Favorable |
2019-05-09 | Senate | Referred by Senate to Committee on Appropriations |
2019-05-09 | Senate | Senate Adopted Senate Amendment Schedule A 8246 |
2019-04-17 | Senate | File Number 721 |
2019-04-17 | Senate | Senate Calendar Number 359 |
2019-04-17 | Senate | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate |
2019-04-17 | Senate | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2019-04-11 | Senate | Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 04/16/19 5:00 PM |
2019-04-02 | Senate | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2019-03-29 | Senate | Joint Favorable |
2019-03-21 | Senate | Public Hearing 03/25 |
2019-02-15 | Senate | Referred to Joint Committee on Public Health |