CT SB00861 | 2019 | General Assembly

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on June 26 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-06-26 - Signed by the Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]

Summary

To redefine "service in time of war" and to remove a two-year residency requirement for certain veterans' services.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

An Act Concerning The Definition Of "service In Time Of War" And State Residency Requirements For Certain Veterans' Services.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-06-04 - House - House Roll Call Vote 322 (Y: 150 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-05-17 - Senate - Senate Roll Call Vote 170 (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-12 - Joint - VA Vote Tally Sheet (Y: 16 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-06-26SenateSigned by the Governor
2019-06-17SenateTransmitted by Secretary of the State to Governor
2019-06-17SenateTransmitted to the Secretary of State
2019-06-12SenatePublic Act 19-33
2019-06-04SenateIn Concurrence
2019-06-04SenateHouse Passed
2019-05-17SenateHouse Calendar Number 616
2019-05-17SenateFavorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House
2019-05-16SenateOn Consent Calendar
2019-05-16SenateSenate Passed
2019-03-28SenateFile Number 227
2019-03-28SenateSenate Calendar Number 135
2019-03-28SenateFavorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate
2019-03-28SenateReported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office
2019-03-22SenateReferred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 03/27/19 5:00 PM
2019-03-13SenateFiled with Legislative Commissioners' Office
2019-03-12SenateJoint Favorable
2019-03-01SenatePublic Hearing 03/07
2019-02-15SenateReferred to Joint Committee on Veterans' Affairs

Connecticut State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback