CT SB00863 | 2019 | General Assembly

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum:
Status: Passed on July 8 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-07-08 - Signed by the Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]

Summary

To prohibit an employer from discriminating against, disciplining or discharging an employee because the employee is a member of the civil air patrol or is absent from work under certain circumstances as a member of the civil air patrol.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

An Act Concerning Employment Protection For Members Of The Civil Air Patrol.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-06-05 - House - House Roll Call Vote 354 (Y: 150 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-05-10 - Senate - Senate Roll Call Vote 128 PASS (Y: 35 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-22 - Joint - JUD Vote Tally Sheet (Joint Favorable) (Y: 36 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2019-03-12 - Joint - VA Vote Tally Sheet (Y: 16 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-07-08SenateSigned by the Governor
2019-06-24SenateTransmitted by Secretary of the State to Governor
2019-06-24SenateTransmitted to the Secretary of State
2019-06-19SenatePublic Act 19-95
2019-06-05SenateIn Concurrence
2019-06-05SenateHouse Passed
2019-05-13SenateHouse Calendar Number 578
2019-05-13SenateFavorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House
2019-05-10SenateSenate Passed
2019-04-23SenateFavorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate
2019-04-23SenateNo New File by Committee on Judiciary
2019-04-23SenateReported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office
2019-04-23SenateFiled with Legislative Commissioners' Office
2019-04-22SenateJoint Favorable
2019-04-17SenateReferred by Senate to Committee on Judiciary
2019-03-28SenateFile Number 228
2019-03-28SenateSenate Calendar Number 136
2019-03-28SenateFavorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate
2019-03-28SenateReported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office
2019-03-22SenateReferred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 03/27/19 5:00 PM
2019-03-13SenateFiled with Legislative Commissioners' Office
2019-03-12SenateJoint Favorable
2019-03-01SenatePublic Hearing 03/07
2019-02-15SenateReferred to Joint Committee on Veterans' Affairs

Connecticut State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback