CT SB00865 | 2019 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Introduced on March 15 2016 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-03-19 - Favorable Change of Reference, House to Committee on Finance, Revenue and Bonding
Pending: Joint Finance, Revenue and Bonding Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on March 15 2016 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-03-19 - Favorable Change of Reference, House to Committee on Finance, Revenue and Bonding
Pending: Joint Finance, Revenue and Bonding Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Summary
To establish the STEM Loan Subsidy Program to provide persons employed in science, technology, engineering or math fields with no or low interest student loans.
Title
An Act Concerning No Or Low Interest Student Loans For Certain Students.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-03-12 - Joint - HED Vote Tally Sheet (Y: 18 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-03-19 | Senate | Favorable Change of Reference, House to Committee on Finance, Revenue and Bonding |
2019-03-18 | Senate | Favorable Change of Reference, Senate to Committee on Finance, Revenue and Bonding |
2019-03-18 | Senate | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2019-03-12 | Senate | Joint Favorable Change of Reference Finance, Revenue and Bonding |
2019-02-22 | Senate | Public Hearing 02/28 |
2019-02-20 | Senate | Referred to Joint Committee on Higher Education and Employment Advancement |
2016-03-15 | Senate | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office |