CT SB00868 | 2019 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum:
Status: Introduced on February 20 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-03-25 - Favorable Change of Reference, House to Committee on Finance, Revenue and Bonding
Pending: Joint Finance, Revenue and Bonding Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 20 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-03-25 - Favorable Change of Reference, House to Committee on Finance, Revenue and Bonding
Pending: Joint Finance, Revenue and Bonding Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Summary
To increase the amount of bond funds available for grants for commercial rail line improvements.
Title
An Act Authorizing Bonds Of The State For Commercial Rail Freight Line Improvements.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-03-20 - Joint - TRA Vote Tally Sheet (Y: 36 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-03-25 | Senate | Favorable Change of Reference, House to Committee on Finance, Revenue and Bonding |
2019-03-22 | Senate | Favorable Change of Reference, Senate to Committee on Finance, Revenue and Bonding |
2019-03-22 | Senate | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2019-03-21 | Senate | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2019-03-20 | Senate | Joint Favorable Change of Reference Finance, Revenue and Bonding |
2019-02-21 | Senate | Public Hearing 02/25 |
2019-02-20 | Senate | Referred to Joint Committee on Transportation |