CT SB00874 | 2019 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-0)
Status: Introduced on February 21 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-04-04 - Favorable Change of Reference, House to Committee on Appropriations
Pending: Joint Appropriations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 21 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-04-04 - Favorable Change of Reference, House to Committee on Appropriations
Pending: Joint Appropriations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Summary
To implement the Governor's budget recommendations.
Title
An Act Concerning Education Initiatives And Services In Connecticut.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-03-29 - Joint - ED Vote Tally Sheet (Joint Favorable Substitute Change of Reference) (Y: 23 N: 12 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2019-03-29 - Joint - ED Vote Tally Sheet (Y: 22 N: 13 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2019-03-29 - Joint - ED Vote Tally Sheet (Y: 22 N: 13 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-04-04 | Senate | Favorable Change of Reference, House to Committee on Appropriations |
2019-04-03 | Senate | Favorable Change of Reference, Senate to Committee on Appropriations |
2019-04-02 | Senate | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2019-04-01 | Senate | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2019-03-29 | Senate | Joint Favorable Substitute Change of Reference Appropriations |
2019-02-22 | Senate | Public Hearing 03/01 |
2019-02-21 | Senate | Referred to Joint Committee on Education |