CT SB00875 | 2019 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Introduced on February 21 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-03-28 - File Number 229
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 21 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-03-28 - File Number 229
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Summary
To implement the Governor's budget recommendations.
Title
An Act Expanding Connecticut's Offshore Wind Energy Portfolio.
Sponsors
Sen. Martin Looney [D] | Sen. Robert Duff [D] | Rep. Joseph Aresimowicz [D] | Rep. Matthew Ritter [D] |
Rep. Anne Hughes [D] |
Roll Calls
2019-03-14 - Joint - ET Vote Tally Sheet (Y: 17 N: 6 NV: 1 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-03-28 | Senate | File Number 229 |
2019-03-28 | Senate | Senate Calendar Number 115 |
2019-03-28 | Senate | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate |
2019-03-28 | Senate | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2019-03-22 | Senate | Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 03/27/19 5:00 PM |
2019-03-15 | Senate | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2019-03-14 | Senate | Joint Favorable |
2019-02-22 | Senate | Public Hearing 02/26 |
2019-02-21 | Senate | Referred to Joint Committee on Energy and Technology |