CT SB00880 | 2013 | General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 9-1)
Status: Passed on May 20 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-05-28 - Signed by the Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 9-1)
Status: Passed on May 20 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-05-28 - Signed by the Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
To ensure that the pilot program established by special act 11-14 does not lapse and to allow for consideration of the report currently due February 1, 2014.
Title
An Act Concerning Municipal Police Departments And The Renewal Of Certain Alcoholic Liquor Permits.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2013-05-15 - House - House Roll Call Vote 172 (Y: 114 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 31) [PASS]
2013-04-18 - Senate - Senate Roll Call Vote 136 (Y: 36 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-04-18 - Senate - Senate Roll Call Vote 136 (Y: 36 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-05-28 | Senate | Signed by the Governor |
2013-05-22 | Senate | Transmitted by Secretary of the State to Governor |
2013-05-22 | Senate | Transmitted to the Secretary of State |
2013-05-20 | Senate | Special Act 13-4 |
2013-05-15 | Senate | In Concurrence |
2013-05-15 | Senate | House Passed |
2013-04-19 | Senate | House Calendar Number 381 |
2013-04-19 | Senate | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House |
2013-04-18 | Senate | On Consent Calendar |
2013-04-18 | Senate | Senate Passed |
2013-03-26 | Senate | File Number 152 |
2013-03-26 | Senate | Senate Calendar Number 168 |
2013-03-26 | Senate | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate |
2013-03-26 | Senate | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2013-03-19 | Senate | Joint Favorable Substitute |
2013-03-19 | Senate | Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 03/25/13 5:00 PM |
2013-03-14 | Senate | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2013-02-21 | Senate | Public Hearing 02/26 |
2013-02-14 | Senate | Referred to Joint Committee on General Law |